The Micronutrient Initiative is a non-profit organization working exclusively to eliminate vitamin and mineral deficiencies among the world's most vulnerable populations.
Joel Spicer, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2015-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development Canada | $50,000,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
180 Elgin Street, 10th Floor
Ottawa, ON K2P 2K3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-782-6800
Fax number:
613-782-6838
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Nutrition International/ | 2024-03-31 | current |
Nutrition International/ | 2017-04-04 | 2024-03-31 |
Micronutrient Initiative/Initiative pour les micronutriments | 2015-01-20 | 2017-04-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Parliamentary offices |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Writer
Federal Provincial Relations Office, Correspondence Unit |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Canadian International Development Agency, Multilateral |
1999 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Parliamentary offices |
2008 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Parliamentary offices |
2003 to 2007 | Not a designated office |