Advance the understanding and use of Carbon Capture and Storage as a means of managing greenhouse gas emissions
Michael Monea, President & CEO
Address:
198-10 Research Drive
Regina, SK S4S 7J7
Canada
Telephone number:
306-565-5660
Fax number:
306-565-5668
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The International CCS Knowledge Centre/ | 2024-04-16 | current |
The International CCS Knowledge Centre/ | 2017-05-11 | 2024-04-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
James Fann | 2023-10-11 | Current |
James Millar | 2022-05-24 | 2023-10-11 |
Debra Kajati | 2019-11-06 | 2022-05-24 |
Michael Monea | 2017-05-11 | 2019-11-06 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Partnerships and Outreach
National Resources Canada, Policy and Planning Branch |
2010 to March 2017 | Not a designated office |
Director, Business Development Office
National Resources Canada, CanmetENERGY |
2007 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Business Development and Communicatons Office
National Resources Canada, CanmetENERGY |
2002 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Business Development Officer
National Resources Canada, Buildings Group |
1997 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Information Officer
National Resources Canada, National Exhibits Program |
1992 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Associate
Environment and Economy, National Roundtable on the Environment and the Economy |
September 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |