Soy Canada is the national association that represents the soybean value chain in Canada. The organization facilitates cooperation among members and represents the value chain on both domestic and international issues that impact the growth and development of the sector.
Brian Innes, Executive Director
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $271,150.00 | Yes |
Address:
Suite 703
350 Sparks Street
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-617-8483
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Soy Canada Inc./ | 2024-05-21 | current |
Soy Canada Inc./ | 2017-06-01 | 2024-05-21 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Brian Innes | 2021-05-03 | Current |
Ronald Davidson | 2017-11-01 | 2021-05-03 |
DALE ADOLPHE | 2017-06-01 | 2017-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Student
Canada Revenue Agency, International Relations Office |
April 2010 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Student
Canada Revenue Agency, Strategic Integration Division |
June 2009 to March 2010 | Not a designated office |