MDA develops and delivers advanced surveillance and intelligence solutions, defence and maritime systems, radar geospatial imagery, space robotics, satellite antennas, and communication subsystems.
Mike Greenley, President
Address:
9445 Airport Rd
Brampton, ON L6S 4J3
Canada
Telephone number:
905-790-2800
Fax number:
905-790-4400
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
MDA SPACE LTD./ | 2024-05-09 | current |
MDA Ltd./ | 2024-03-26 | 2024-05-09 |
MDA Ltd./ | 2020-04-08 | 2024-03-26 |
MDA GP Holdings Ltd./ | 2018-08-14 | 2020-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
December 2007 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Transport Minister's Office, Transport Minister's Office |
July 2004 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Agriculture Minister's Office, Agriculture Minister's Office |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
International Trade Minister's Office, International Trade Minister's Office |
July 1997 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Press Officer
Prime Minister's Office, Prime Minister's Office |
October 1993 to July 1997 | Not a designated office |
Press Officer
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
April 1992 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
December 2007 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Transport Minister's Office, Transport Minister's Office |
July 2004 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Agriculture Minister's Office, Agriculture Minister's Office |
January 2004 to juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
International Trade Minister's Office, International Trade Minister's Office |
juillet 1997 à août 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Press Officer
Prime Minister's Office, Prime Minister's Office |
octobre 1993 à juillet 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Press Officer
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
avril 1992 à octobre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Major
Department of National Defence, Royal Canadian Air Force |
juillet 1981 à novembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |