Cameco, with its head office in Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, is the world's largest uranium supplier. The company's uranium products are used to generate electricity in nuclear energy plants around the world, providing one of the cleanest sources of energy available today. Cameco's shares trade on the Toronto and New York Stock Exchanges.
GERALD GRANDEY, PRESIDENT AND CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
2121-11TH STREET WEST
SASKATOON, SK S7M 1J3
Canada
Telephone number:
306-956-6285
Fax number:
306-956-6302
CAMECO CORPORATION is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CAMECO CORPORATION | 2024-04-08 | current |
CAMECO CORPORATION | 2008-07-10 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Tim Gitzel | 2011-07-01 | Current |
GERALD GRANDEY | 1996-01-31 | 2011-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Department of Finance, Ministers' Regional Office |
January 2004 to August 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Advisor
Department of Finance, Minister's Office |
December 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Canadian International Development Agency, The Hon. Susan Whelan, P.C., M.P., Minister of International Cooperation and Dev |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, The Hon. Jean Charest, P.C., M.P., Leader of the Progressive Conservative Party |
1993 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
The Senate, The Hon. F. Macdonald, Senator |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, The Honourable Alan Redway, P.C., M.P. |
1990 to 1992 | Not a designated office |