The Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada | $24,775.00 | No |
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $11,654.00 | Yes |
Canadian International Development Agency (CIDA) | $8,981,912.00 | Yes |
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $39,967.00 | Yes |
International Development Research Centre | $456,068.00 | Yes |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 600
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
October 2010 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, International Relations
Natural Resources Canada, Mining and Mineral Sciences Laboratories |
February 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of State (Public Health), Health Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
December 2003 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Carolyn Bennett, MP St. Paul's Ontario |
February 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Policy Development Division, Health Promotions Branch |
January 1998 to December 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
October 2010 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Stakeholder Engagement Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Inter-American Relations & Regional Policy |
April 2008 to July 2008 | Not a designated office |
Public Affairs Program Manager
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Mexico and North America Divisio |
March 2005 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Mexico Division |
April 2004 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Governance Coordinator
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Corporate Secretariat |
January 2011 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Corporate Secretariat |
August 2010 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Short-term Contractor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Embassy of Canada in Beijing |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of Hon. Jim Munson |
January 2006 to January 2009 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Question Period Coordinator
Privy Council Office, Office of the Leader of the Government in the House |
June 2005 to December 2005 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Office of the Prime Minister of Canada, Parliament Hill Office |
June 2003 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Advisor
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council, Public Affairs, External Relations and Communications Division |
September 2008 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Analyst
Department of the Secretary of State of Canada, Education Support Branch |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister of International Trade |
September 2005 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
June 1999 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Department of Human Resources Development Canada, Office of the Minister of Human Resources Development Canada |
October 1996 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Stan Keyes, M.P. (Hamilton West) |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Office of John Manley, M.P. (Ottawa-South) |
September 1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Page
House of Commons, Parliamentary Page Programme |
August 1988 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
2006 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Youth Mobility and Academic Relations |
2004 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst/Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Canada Student Loans Program |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Junior Communications Officer
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Communications Branch |
2001 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Page
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commercial Officer, Educaiton Marketing Group
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Section |
January 2005 to October 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Projects Officer, Southeast Asia Division
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Section |
June 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
January 2009 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficientcy |
March 2008 to January 2009 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Intern
House of Commons, Office of Bob Mills; Office of Michael Ignatieff |
September 2006 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |