THE CFC IS A NATIONAL ORGANIZATION REPRESENTING CHICKEN PRODUCERS NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION WHICH REGULATES PRODUCTION OF CHICKEN UNDER THE SUPPLY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM. CHIEF RESPONSIBILITY IS TO ENSURE THAT CANADIAN CHICKEN PRODUCTION MEETS DOMESTIC NEEDS. AGENCY PLAYS A KEY ROLE IN DEVELOPING CANADA'S INTERNATIONAL AGRICULTURAL TRADE POLICY BY RESPRESENTING PRODUCERS INTERESTS WITH FEDERAL GOVERNMENT. THE CHICKEN FARMERS OF CANADA IA A NATIONAL FARMER- RUN (CHICKEN PRODUCERS) ORGANIZATION.
MIKE DUNGATE, GENERAL MANAGER
Address:
1007 - 350 SPARKS STREET
OTTAWA, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-566-5903
Fax number:
613-241-5999
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chicken Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs de poulet du Canada | 2024-04-22 | current |
Chicken Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs de poulet du Canada | 2008-09-24 | 2024-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Laliberte | 2018-01-01 | Current |
MIKE DUNGATE | 1997-11-03 | 2018-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Office of The Hon. Bill Graham |
January 1999 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Bill Graham |
March 1998 to January 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Murray Calder, M.P. |
June 1997 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Andrew Telegdi, M.P. |
May 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
student summer job
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Alma, Québec |
May 1992 to August 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Hon. Pierre Blais,, Minister of State for Agriculture and Sollicitor General, and Consummers and Cor |
July 1988 to November 1990 | Not a designated office |
student summer job
Office of the Hon. Pierre Blais, Minister of State for Agriculture |
May 1988 to June 1988 | Not a designated office |
Adminsitrative Assistant
Office of the Hon. Pierre Blais,, Minister of State for Agriculture |
January 1988 to May 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Steve Mahoney, PC MP |
1999 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant/Legislative Advisor
House of Commons, Jean Payne, MP |
1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant, Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Benoit Serre, MP |
1993 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, George Rideout, MP |
1989 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Roy MacLaren MP |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Customs Officer
Revenue Canada: Customs and Excise, Vancouver |
1998 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Student Placement Officer
Employment and Immigration Canada, North Vancouver |
May 1996 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Ottawa and New Delhi |
1989 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Office of Edna MacKenzie, Director of Public Information Office |
July 1995 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Public Information Office, Parliamentary Page and Guide Program |
October 1992 to August 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administration Officer
Canagrex, Canagrex |
1985 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Agricultural Worker, Summer Student
Centre for Food and Animal Research, Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada |
April 1997 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Assistant
Centre for Food and Animal Research, Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada |
September 1996 to May 1997 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Eastern Cereal and Oilseed Research Centre,, Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada |
1993 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Secreatary
Department of Communications, Indsutry Canada |
March 1991 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Auxiliary
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada |
May 2004 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Office of The Hon. Bill Graham |
January 1999 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Bill Graham |
March 1998 to January 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Murray Calder, M.P. |
June 1997 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Andrew Telegdi, M.P. |
May 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |