NAV CANADA was incorporated on May 26, 1995 as a not-for-profit corporation under the Canada Corporations Act and was continued under the Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act on January 17, 2013. The objectives of the company are to acquire, own, manage, operate and develop the Canadian air navigation system and services in and over Canada and in such international airspace the responsibility for which has been delegated to Canada pursuant to international agreement. Under the Civil Air Navigation Services Commercialization Act, the company has been granted the exclusive right and obligation to provide civil air traffic control, civil aeronautical information and specified flight information.
JOHN CRICHTON, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
77 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5L6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-7000
Fax number:
613-563-3487
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
NAV CANADA | 2024-05-01 | current |
NAV CANADA | 2008-07-09 | 2024-05-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Raymond Bohn | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Neil Wilson | 2016-01-01 | 2021-01-01 |
JOHN CRICHTON | 1998-08-17 | 2016-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Principle Human Performance Analyst
Transportation Safety Board of Canada, Aviation |
1997 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Material Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services Transfer Team |
July 1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1982 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Transort Canada, Airports - Ground Side |
January 1984 to December 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Regional Automation Implementation Manager
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Data Systems Coordinator
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
1986 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
1976 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air |
March 1980 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
November 1990 to November 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
January 1992 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
March 1977 to December 1978 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager of Software
Correctional Services, No Branch or Unit |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Transport Canada, Facilties, Equipment, Systems Department |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Software Engineer
Transport Canada, Facilities, Equipment, Systems Department |
1974 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Advisor Canadian Defence Liaison Staff, London, England
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1992 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Director of Safety
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Base Commander, Goose Bay
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1984 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Officer of Canadian Forces
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1965 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
December 1992 to November 1996 | Not a designated office |
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services Services |
March 1991 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluations Branch |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Surface
Transport Canada, Crown Corporations & Subsidies |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Analyst, User Impact
Transport Canada, Cost Recovery Branch |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1982 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Engineer, Technical Services Department
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1974 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Information Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services (Transport Canada Training Institute) |
October 1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Technology Support
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
October 1994 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Maintenance and Installation Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
December 1990 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 to December 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Electronic Technologist, Gander, NL
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1979 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Principle Human Performance Analyst
Transportation Safety Board of Canada, Aviation |
1997 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Office Manager
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Legal Department |
November 1991 to October 1992 | Not a designated office |
Paralegal
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Legal Department |
March 1989 to November 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Operational Requirements Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Operations Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
August 1990 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
December 1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Accommodation Officer
Environment Canada, Human Resources |
March 1988 to October 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Control Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
January 1993 to November 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
December 1987 to January 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
June 1992 to November 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Traffic Services |
July 1990 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Public Service Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
May 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Public Services Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
May 1984 to August 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Enroute Controller
Transport Canada, ANS Department |
1992 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Health, Health Canada |
January 1996 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Public Works and Government Special Services, Publics Work and Goverment Services Canada |
January 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Privy Council Office, Machinery of Goverment Secretariat |
June 1992 to November 1994 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Canada Border Services Agency, Border Information Services |
May 1991 to August 1995 | Not a designated office |
Clerk
Canada Revenue Agency, GST Department |
May 1990 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager Area Control Centre Operations
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Quebec Units
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Operations |
February 1989 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Pilot Training
Department of National Defence, Air Force |
1986 to January 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Project Manager, George A. Scott Centre, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1994 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Instructor, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1989 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Instructor and Technician
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Technician, Timmins Airport
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1983 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Procurement Officer
Department of Supply and Services, Procurement Office |
June 1977 to September 1981 | Not a designated office |