NATIONAL TRADE ASSOCIATION OF FEDERALLY INSPECTED MEAT PACKERS/ PROCESSORS. Canadian Meat Council SERVES AS A VEHICLE TO EXPRESS THE COLLECTIVE VIEWS OF THE MEMBERSHIP AND TO SPEAK FOR THE MEAT PACKING/ PROCESSING INDUSTRY IN CANADA AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMPETITIVENESS OF THE INDUSTRY DOMESTICALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Jim Laws, Executive Director
Address:
1545 Carling Avenue
Suite 407
Ottawa, ON K1Z 8P9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-729-3911
Fax number:
613-729-4997
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Meat Council/Conseil des Viandes du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Canadian Meat Council/Conseil des Viandes du Canada | 2008-08-07 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Christopher White | 2017-03-13 | Current |
Jim Laws | 2005-07-22 | 2017-03-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director Corporate Relations and Strategic Planning
CBC/Radio-Canada, Corporate Relations and Strategic Planning |
November 1997 to March 1999 | Not a designated office |
International Business Development Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Services Industry and Transportation Division |
June 1993 to June 1995 | Not a designated office |
Program Planning Officer
Petro-Canada International Assistance Corporation, Petro-Canada International Assistance Corporation |
June 1983 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief Dairy Processing & Marketing Services
Agriculture Canada, Markets and Industry Services Branch |
December 1990 to May 1994 | Not a designated office |
Trade Policy Analyst
Agriculture Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
February 1989 to December 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director Corporate Relations and Strategic Planning
CBC/Radio-Canada, Corporate Relations and Strategic Planning |
November 1997 to March 1999 | Not a designated office |
International Business Development Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Services Industry and Transportation Division |
June 1993 to June 1995 | Not a designated office |
Program Planning Officer
Petro-Canada International Assistance Corporation, Petro-Canada International Assistance Corporation |
June 1983 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Ambassador of Canada
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Saudi Arabia, Oman, Bahrain, Yemen |
September 2007 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Commissioner Service Initiatives |
September 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Director Latin America, Caribbean, Middle East and Africa
International Trade Canada, Bilateral Commercial Relations Division |
August 2005 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Consul General of Canada
International Trade Canada, Sao Paulo, Brazil |
September 2002 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Director
International Trade Canada, South America Division |
September 2000 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director, International Business Development
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, South America Division |
October 1999 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Counsellor Commercial Japan
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Embassy of Canada |
August 1994 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Technical Barriers and Regulations Division |
July 1993 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Senior Officer, Standards and Enforcement
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Rules Division |
September 1992 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Negotiations Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Office of Trilateral Trade Negotiations |
September 1991 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Counsellor Commercial France
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Embassy of Canada Paris, France |
August 1987 to August 1991 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, International Market Development Division |
September 1983 to July 1987 | Not a designated office |
Senior International Market Development Officer
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, International Market Development Division |
September 1980 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |
First Secretary Commercial
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Embassy of Canada in Washington, DC |
August 1977 to August 1980 | Not a designated office |
Senior Secretariat Officer Parliamentary Relations
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Office of the Deputy Minister |
July 1974 to July 1977 | Not a designated office |
Registration and Enforcement Officer
Agriculture Canada, Plant Products Division |
June 1971 to June 1974 | Not a designated office |