FOUNDED IN 1971, CFIB IS A NON-PROFIT, NON-PARTISAN BUSINESS ORGANIZATION WHICH EXISTS TO PROMOTE & PROTECT A SYSTEM OF FREE COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE, TO STRENGTHEN THE ENTREPRENEURIAL CULTURE IN CANADA AND TO GIVE INDEPENDENT BUSINESS A GREATER VOICE IN DETERMINING THE LAWS THAT GOVERN BUSINESS AND THE NATION. IT IS THE LARGEST ORGANIZATION EXCLUSIVELY REPRESENTING THE SMALL- AND MEDIUM-SIZED BUSINESS COMMUNITY ACROSS CANADA. THE FEDERATION IS UNIQUE AS A POLITICAL ACTION ORGANIZATION BECAUSE IT IS THE MEMBERSHIP THAT SETS THE ORGANIZATION'S POLICIES & PRIORITIES BY REFERENDUM & CENSUS. IT IS FOUNDED ON THE PRINCIPLE OF ONE MEMBER- ONE VOTE. ANALYSIS OF THE VOTE RESULTS AND THE IMPLICATIONS LEAD TO A FORMAL CFIB POSITION ON AN ISSUE.
CATHERINE SWIFT, PRESIDENT, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER AND CHAIR WOMAN
Address:
401 - 4141 YONGE STREET
TORONTO, ON M2P 2A6
Canada
Telephone number:
416-222-8022
Fax number:
416-222-4337
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Federation of Independent Business (CFIB)/Fédération canadienne de l’entreprise indépendante (FCEI) | 2024-04-15 | current |
Canadian Federation of Independent Business (CFIB)/Fédération canadienne de l’entreprise indépendante (FCEI) | 2008-08-11 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Daniel Kelly | 2012-06-08 | Current |
CATHERINE SWIFT | 1997-07-31 | 2012-06-08 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Business Development Director
Canadian International Development Agency contract, Almaty, Kazahstan, Asia |
October 1999 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor, Federal/Provincial Relations
Department of Supply & Services Canada, Regina, Saskatchewan |
November 1989 to June 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy
Department of External Affairs, Agriculture, Fish and Food Pruducts Division |
May 1986 to August 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Parks Canada, Parks Canada |
May 1994 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Country Inventory
Canadian Wheat Board, Finance Division |
May 2002 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Country Inventory
Canadian Wheat Board, Finance Division |
May 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commerce Officer
Department of Consumer and Corporate Affairs, Department of Consumer and Corporate Affairs |
May 1975 to August 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Immigration officer
Emploi et Immigration Canada, Emploi et Immigration Canada |
January 1989 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Provincial Affairs
Minister of Labour, International Relations |
June 1971 to October 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Researcher, Associate Producer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
August 1996 to April 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Business Development Director
Canadian International Development Agency contract, Almaty, Kazahstan, Asia |
October 1999 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Database Clerk
Veteran's Affairs, Student Work program |
June 1999 to October 1999 | Not a designated office |
Administrative and Research officer
Veteran's Affairs, Student work program |
June 1999 to October 1999 | Not a designated office |