Rogers Communications Inc. is a diversified Canadian communications and media company engaged in three primary lines of business. Those businesses are operated through subsidiary companies; Rogers Cable Inc., Canada's largest cable television service provider, offering cable television, high speed internet access and video retailing; Rogers Wireless Inc.,Canada's largest wireless voice and data communications services provider and the country's only carrier operating on the world standard GSM/GPRS technology platform; and Rogers Media Inc.which owns and operates a collection of well known media assets, including radio and television broadcasting stations, a televised home shopping service, magazine publishing and sports entertainment.
Guy Laurence, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
333 Bloor Street East, 10th Floor
Toronto, ON M4W 1G9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-935-7102
Rogers Communications Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Rogers Communications Inc. | 2024-04-15 | current |
Rogers Communications Inc. | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Anthony Staffieri | 2021-11-16 | Current |
Joe Natale | 2017-04-19 | 2021-11-16 |
Alan D. Horn | 2016-10-16 | 2017-04-19 |
Guy Laurence | 2013-12-02 | 2016-10-16 |
Nadir Mohamed | 2009-09-16 | 2013-12-02 |
Alan D. Horn | 2008-12-02 | 2009-09-16 |
Edward S. Rogers | 2005-08-19 | 2008-12-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 2000 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Office of the Minister |
May 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Office of the Chairman |
July 1992 to July 1995 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Legal Directorate |
June 1990 to July 1992 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Cable Distribution Directortate |
September 1987 to November 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant, Communications
Dept. of Small Business and Tourism, Office of the Minister, |
January 1984 to December 1984 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant, Communications
Department of Communications, Office of the Minister |
January 1982 to January 1984 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant, Communications
House of Commons, Office of David Smith, MP |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Leading Wren
Department of National Defence, Royal Canadian Naval Reserve |
July 1984 to October 1984 | Not a designated office |