Rogers Communications Inc. is a leading diversified public Canadian communications and media company. The company operates in four main areas: Wireless, Cable, Business Solutions and Media. Rogers Communications Inc. provides a broad range of services to individual consumers and businesses, including wireless voice and data communications, high-speed Internet, cable television, cable telephony, and data networking services. The company also provides services in radio and television broadcasting, multi-platform shopping, consumer magazines and trade publications, sports media and entertainment, and digital media
Alan D. Horn, Chairman, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
333 Bloor Street East, 10th Floor
Toronto, ON M4W 1G9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-935-3555
Rogers Communications Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Rogers Communications Inc. | 2024-04-15 | current |
Rogers Communications Inc. | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Anthony Staffieri | 2021-11-16 | Current |
Joe Natale | 2017-04-19 | 2021-11-16 |
Alan D. Horn | 2016-10-16 | 2017-04-19 |
Guy Laurence | 2013-12-02 | 2016-10-16 |
Nadir Mohamed | 2009-09-16 | 2013-12-02 |
Alan D. Horn | 2008-12-02 | 2009-09-16 |
Edward S. Rogers | 2005-08-19 | 2008-12-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 2000 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Office of the Minister |
May 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Office of the Chairman |
July 1992 to July 1995 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Legal Directorate |
June 1990 to July 1992 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission (CRTC), Cable Distribution Directortate |
September 1987 to November 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Control Room Technician, Production Assistant, Producer/Director, Executive Producer, and Deputy Head of Sports
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, CBC Sports |
June 1975 to July 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Intern
House of Commons, Parliamentary Internship Programme |
September 2011 to June 2012 | Not a designated office |
Census Enumerator
Statistics Canada, Census Program |
May 2011 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |