Services incidental to Agriculture. Producer / distributor of Agricultural products.
Kamel Beliazi, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
160 Quarry Park Blvd., SE
Suite 200
Calgary, AB T2C 3G3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-722-8111
Ext.
225
Fax number:
613-722-1407
Bayer CropScience Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bayer CropScience Inc. | 2024-04-22 | current |
Bayer CropScience Inc. | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Antoine Bernet | 2023-09-01 | Current |
Al Driver | 2015-01-01 | 2023-09-01 |
Kamel Beliazi | 2009-07-01 | 2015-01-01 |
Hartmut van Lengerich | 2005-08-10 | 2009-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Section Head
Health Canada, PMRA-Food Residue Exposure Assessment Section |
1995 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Section Head
Health Canada, Agricultural Chemical Section |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Section Evaluator
Health Canada, Agricultural Chemical Secion |
1987 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Manager
Dept. of Fisheries and Oceans, Environmental Protection Service and Laboratory Services |
1985 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Programmer/Analyst
Environment Canada, EPS & DFO Laboratory Services |
1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |