Total Number of Communication Reports: 144
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Agrium Inc. is a leading global producer and marketer of agricultural nutrients and industrial products and a major retail supplier of agricultural products and services in both North and South America. Agrium produces and markets three primary groups of nutrients: nitrogen, phosphate, potash as well as micronutrients.
Mike Wilson, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
13131 Lake Fraser Drive
Calgary, AB T2J 7E8
Canada
Telephone number:
403-225-7000
Agrium Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Agrium Inc. | 2008-08-07 | 2018-05-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Charles Magro | 2017-08-01 | 2018-05-16 |
Mike Wilson | 2005-08-16 | 2015-12-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Social Development Canada, Office of the Minister of Social Development |
September 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Office of the Minister of Agriculture and Agri-Food |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Office of the Minister of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
December 2003 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada; Industry Canada, Secretary of State (Rural Development)(FedNor) |
April 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament for Dufferin-Peel-Wellington-Grey |
April 2002 to April 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament for Haldimand-Norfolk |
September 1999 to April 2002 | Not a designated office |