BCE is a Holding company, serving all Canadians through the provision of wired, wireless and direct-to-home satellite communications, and through investments in research and development of innovative products and services that allow Canadians and Canadian enterprise to compete in the global economy.
George Cope, President and CEO
Address:
1, Carrefour Alexander Graham Bell, Building A, 6th Floor
Verdun, QC H3E 3B3
Canada
Telephone number:
416-353-3500
BCE Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bell Canada/ | 2024-04-12 | current |
Bell Canada/ | 2022-08-01 | 2024-04-12 |
BCE Inc. | 2011-05-30 | 2022-08-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
MIRKO BIBIC | 2020-01-06 | Current |
George Cope | 2011-05-30 | 2020-01-06 |
Michael Sabia | 2005-08-26 | 2008-05-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor to the Minister
Industry Canada, Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency |
August 1999 to November 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Member of Parliament - St. John's East
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
October 1993 to May 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Parliamentary Hill Manager
Minister of the Crown, Honourable John Manley |
July 1998 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant, Surface Policy
Transport Canada May 1992 to October 1993, Office of the Minister of State |
May 1992 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |