Sun Life is a leading international financial services organization providing insurance, wealth and asset management solutions to individual and corporate Clients. Sun Life has operations in a number of markets worldwide, including Canada, the United States, the United Kingdom, Ireland, Hong Kong, the Philippines, Japan, Indonesia, India, China, Australia, Singapore, Vietnam, Malaysia and Bermuda. As of December 31, 2019, Sun Life had total assets under management of $1,099 billion.
Kevin Strain, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1 York Street
Toronto, ON M5J 0B6
Canada
Telephone number:
416-979-9966
Sun Life Financial Inc. / Financière Sun Life is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Sun Life Financial Inc./Financière Sun Life | 2024-05-14 | current |
Sun Life Financial Inc./Financière Sun Life | 2008-08-13 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kevin Strain | 2021-08-06 | Current |
Dean Connor | 2011-12-01 | 2021-08-06 |
Donald Stewart | 2005-08-11 | 2011-12-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Dianne Watts Office |
November 2015 to September 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Public Affairs
Export Development Canada, Corporate Affairs |
May 2013 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Dianne Watts Office |
November 2015 to September 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2007 to October 2009 | October 3, 2009 |