Since 1871, Scotiabank has been a chartered bank under the Bank Act in Canada. The Bank and its subsidiaries provide a full range of banking and related financial services including personal, commercial, corporate and investment banking services through a network of branches and offices in all the provinces and territories outside Canada. The Bank has branches and offices in some 50 countries which provide a wide range of banking and related financial services either directly or through subsidiary and associated banks, trust companies and other financial firms.
Richard Waugh, President & CEO
Address:
6-40 King Street W.
PC&GA
Toronto, ON M5H 1H1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-933-1401
Fax number:
416-866-5929
Scotiabank / Banque Scotia is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2024-05-06 | current |
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2008-07-29 | 2024-05-06 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Scott Thomson | 2023-03-01 | Current |
Brian Porter | 2013-11-01 | 2023-03-01 |
Richard Waugh | 2005-08-19 | 2013-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Tour and Operations
Office of the Prime Minister, Tour and Operations |
August 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Ontario
Heritage Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant- Ontario and Western Canada
Agriculture Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) |
March 2003 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Art Eggleton, MP |
March 2001 to March 2003 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Roy Cullen, MP |
April 2000 to March 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Tour and Operations
Office of the Prime Minister, Tour and Operations |
August 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Ontario
Heritage Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant- Ontario and Western Canada
Agriculture Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) |
March 2003 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Art Eggleton, MP |
March 2001 to March 2003 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Roy Cullen, MP |
April 2000 to March 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Jason Kenney, MP, House of Commons |
September 2004 to March 2007 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Opposition Leader's Office, House of Commons |
January 2003 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
James Rajotte, MP, House of Commons |
December 2000 to January 2003 | Not a designated office |