Since 1871, Scotiabank has been a chartered bank under the Bank Act in Canada. The Bank and its subsidiaries provide a full range of banking and related financial services including personal, commercial, corporate and investment banking services through a network of branches and offices in all the provinces and territories outside Canada. The Bank has branches and offices in some 50 countries which provide a wide range of banking and related financial services either directly or through subsidiary and associated banks, trust companies and other financial firms.
Brian Porter, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
6-40 King Street W.
PC&GA
Toronto, ON M5H 1H1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-933-1401
Scotiabank / Banque Scotia is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2024-05-06 | current |
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2008-07-29 | 2024-05-06 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Scott Thomson | 2023-03-01 | Current |
Brian Porter | 2013-11-01 | 2023-03-01 |
Richard Waugh | 2005-08-19 | 2013-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Tour and Operations
Office of the Prime Minister, Tour and Operations |
août 2004 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant - Ontario
Heritage Canada, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2004 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant- Ontario and Western Canada
Agriculture Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) |
mars 2003 à janvier 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Art Eggleton, MP |
mars 2001 à mars 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Roy Cullen, MP |
avril 2000 à mars 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |