The University of Alberta is one of Canada's premiere research-intensive universities, engaging in teaching, research, innovation and community service. The University of Alberta's undergraduate and graduate student enrollment totals over 34,000. The University employs over 8800 academic and non-academic staff.
Indira Samarasekera, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2014-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chairs | $17,408,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $27,705,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research | $38,878,000.00 | Yes |
Foreign governments, municipalities, hospitals and universities | $8,646,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $772,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $46,951,000.00 | Yes |
Other federal | $20,418,000.00 | Yes |
Other provincial, municipalities, hospitals and universities | $21,224,000.00 | Yes |
Provincial | $847,567,000.00 | Yes |
Social Science and Humanities Research Council | $24,932,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
2-24 South Academic Building
University of Alberta
Edmonton, AB T6G 2G7
Canada
Telephone number:
780-492-6590
Fax number:
780-492-9453
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Alberta | 2024-04-12 | current |
University of Alberta | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bill Flanagan | 2020-07-01 | Current |
David Turpin | 2015-07-01 | 2020-07-01 |
Indira Samarasekera | 2005-08-19 | 2015-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Prime Minister
Office of the Prime Minister, Office of the Prime Minister |
June 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Federal-Provincial Relations
Government of Canada, Finance |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Veterans Affairs
Government of Canada, Veterans Affairs |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Defence and Cabinet Operations Committee
Government of Canada, Defence |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General
Government of Canada, Justice |
February 1990 to January 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State for Indian Affairs and Northern Development
Government of Canada, Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
January 1989 to February 1990 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament, Vancouver Centre
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
November 1988 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-op Student
Energy, Mines and Resources Canada, Mineral Processing Laboratories |
May 1979 to April 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Prime Minister
Office of the Prime Minister, Office of the Prime Minister |
June 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Federal-Provincial Relations
Government of Canada, Finance |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Veterans Affairs
Government of Canada, Veterans Affairs |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Defence and Cabinet Operations Committee
Government of Canada, Defence |
January 1993 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General
Government of Canada, Justice |
February 1990 to January 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State for Indian Affairs and Northern Development
Government of Canada, Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
January 1989 to February 1990 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament, Vancouver Centre
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
November 1988 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |