Suncor Energy Inc. is an integrated energy company headquartered in Calgary, Alberta. Suncor's oil sands business, located near Fort McMurray, Alberta, extracts and upgrades oil sands and markets refinery feedstock and diesel fuel, while operations throughout western Canada produce natural gas. Suncor operates a refining and marketing business in Ontario with retail distribution under the Sunoco brand. U.S.A. downstream assets include pipeline and refining operations in Colorado and Wyoming and retail sales in the Denver area under the Phillips 66® brand. Suncor's common shares (symbol: SU) are listed on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges. Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc. is an authorized licensee of the Phillips 66® brand and marks in the state of Colorado. Sunoco in Canada is separate and unrelated to Sunoco in the United States, which is owned by Sunoco, Inc. of Philadelphia.
Richard George, President and C.E.O.
End date of the last completed financial year: 2007-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Alberta Advanced Education & Technology | $0.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $3,970,944.29 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Agriculture, Food and Rural Affairs - Ontario Ethanol Growth Fund | $28,937,267.08 | Yes |
Address:
P.O. Box 38
112-4th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 2V5
Canada
Telephone number:
403-269-8703
Fax number:
403-269-6217
Suncor Energy Inc. / Suncor Énergie Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2024-01-01 | current |
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2008-07-22 | 2024-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Richard Kruger | 2023-04-03 | Current |
Kris Smith | 2022-07-08 | 2023-04-03 |
Mark Little | 2019-05-02 | 2022-07-08 |
Steven Williams | 2012-05-01 | 2019-05-02 |
Richard George | 2005-08-04 | 2012-05-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Oceanographic survey |
May 1979 to October 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Mail carrier / driver
Canada Post, N/A |
December 1977 to December 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Naval Officer
Canadian Forces, Navy |
1999 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Naval Officer
Canadian Forces, Navy |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Cadet
Canadian Forces, Royalty Military College |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Infratry Soldier
Canadian Forces, N/A |
1984 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-op student
Energy, Mines and Resources, Mineral Processing Lab |
September 1977 to December 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Environment Canada, Canada Centre for Inland Waters |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Second Lieutenant
Canadian Forces, Reserves |
September 1983 to December 1985 | Not a designated office |
Officer Cadet
Canadian Forces, Reserves |
1982 to September 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Atomic Energy Canada, N/A |
May 1981 to August 1981 | Not a designated office |