Suncor Energy Inc. is Canada's premier integrated energy company. Suncor's operations include oil sands development and upgrading, conventional and offshore oil and gas production, petroleum refining, and product marketing under the Petro-Canada brand. While working to responsibly develop petroleum resources, Suncor is also developing a growing renewable energy portfolio. Suncor's common shares (symbol: SU) are listed on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges.
Steven Williams, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2015-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Alberta Innovates- Energy & Environment Solutions | $725,000.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Agriculture, Food and Rural Affairs | $4,128,095.00 | Yes |
Quebec Ministry of Agriculture, Food and Rural Affairs | $850,188.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $538,410.00 | Yes |
Address:
P.O. Box 2844
150 6 Ave SW
Calgary, AB T2P 3E3
Canada
Telephone number:
403-296-8000
Fax number:
403-724-3460
Suncor Energy Inc. / Suncor Énergie Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2024-01-01 | current |
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2008-07-22 | 2024-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Richard Kruger | 2023-04-03 | Current |
Kris Smith | 2022-07-08 | 2023-04-03 |
Mark Little | 2019-05-02 | 2022-07-08 |
Steven Williams | 2012-05-01 | 2019-05-02 |
Richard George | 2005-08-04 | 2012-05-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Regional Affairs (Calagry)
Environment Canada, Office of the Minister of the Environment |
February 2009 to November 2010 | November 4, 2010 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of the Environment, Minister's Office |
October 2008 to February 2009 | February 2, 2009 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Industry, Minister's Office |
September 2007 to October 2008 | October 30, 2008 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Indian and Northern Affairs, Minister's Office |
September 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Regional Affairs (Calagry)
Environment Canada, Office of the Minister of the Environment |
February 2009 to November 2010 | November 4, 2010 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of the Environment, Minister's Office |
October 2008 to February 2009 | February 2, 2009 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Industry, Minister's Office |
September 2007 to October 2008 | October 30, 2008 |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Indian and Northern Affairs, Minister's Office |
September 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Minerals, Metals and Materials Policy Branch
Natural Resources Canada, Minerals, Metals and Materials Sector |
September 2009 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
National Director
Fisheries and Oceans, Environmental Assessment and Major Project Reviews |
June 2005 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Executive Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Deputy Minister's Office |
June 2002 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Senior Analyst
Privy Council Office, Senior Personnel and Management Priorities |
November 2000 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Port and Harbour Divestitures |
January 2000 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Senior Project Officer
Veterans Affairs Canada, Transition Management Team/Veterans Services Branch |
June 1998 to November 1998 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Benefit Processing & Overpayment Unit
Veterans Affairs Canada, Benefit Division/Veteran Services Branch |
February 1997 to June 1998 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Resource Management Unit
Veterans Affairs Canada, Benefit Division/Veterans Services Branch |
April 1994 to February 1997 | Not a designated office |
Executive Officer to the Director General
Veterans Affairs Canada, Benefits Division/Veterans Services Branch |
September 1990 to April 1994 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Officer
Veterans Affairs Canada, Disability Pensions Division Programs Branch |
December 1988 to September 1990 | Not a designated office |
Entitlement Clerk
Veterans Affairs Canada, Disability Pensions Program Branch |
September 1988 to December 1988 | Not a designated office |
Office Manager
Agriculture Canada, Agriculture Development Branch |
June 1984 to September 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Multiculturalism and Citizenship, Office of the Minister |
May 1992 to September 1993 | Not a designated office |