Total Number of Communication Reports: 107
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
The University of Winnipeg received its charter in 1967 but its roots date back more than 130 years. The founding colleges were Manitoba College (1871) and Wesley College (1888), which merged to form United College in 1938. Located in the heart of downtown, The University of Winnipeg is a compact, diverse, multicultural academic community committed to access and excellence. Ranked by our graduates in Maclean's magazine University Graduate Survey (June 19, 2006) in the Top Ten of all Canadian universities when asked about their "Entire Educational Experience". UWinnipeg is home to more than 9200 full and part-time students.
Lloyd Axworthy, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $24,900.00 | Yes |
Canadian Agri-Food and Development Initiative | $14,800.00 | Yes |
Canadian Bureau for International Education | $30,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $642,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $31,200.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $66,400.00 | Yes |
Canadian International Development Agency (CIDA) | $30,700.00 | Yes |
Canadian Space Agency (CSA) | $71,800.00 | Yes |
Council on Post-Secondary Education (COPSE) (Operating Grant) | $57,546,100.00 | Yes |
Environment Canada | $159,200.00 | Yes |
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) | $8,900.00 | Yes |
Indian and Northern Affairs | $2,800.00 | Yes |
International Development Research Centre (IDRC) | $2,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $1,526,800.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Capital Grants | $526,400.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Department of Education | $2,064,700.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Healthy Living Youth & Seniors | $30,700.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Manitoba Conservation | $24,800.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Manitoba Habitat Heritage Corporation | $1,000.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Manitoba Health Research Council | $34,400.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Manitoba Research and Innovation Fund | $326,400.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Manitoba Scholarship & Bursary Initiative | $738,000.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Water Stewardship Fund | $36,600.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $1,749,900.00 | Yes |
Western Economic Diversification Canada (WD) | $689,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
515 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3B 2E9
Canada
Telephone number:
204-786-9214
Fax number:
204-786-1693
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The University of Winnipeg | 2024-03-31 | current |
The University of Winnipeg | 2008-07-11 | 2024-03-31 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Todd Mondor | 2022-04-01 | Current |
James Currie | 2020-08-01 | 2022-04-01 |
Annette Trimbee | 2014-08-01 | 2020-08-01 |
Neil Besner | 2014-07-01 | 2014-08-01 |
Lloyd Axworthy | 2005-08-25 | 2014-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Regional Executive Director
Department of Canadian Heritage, Prairie & Northwest Territories Region |
November 1993 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director General, Communications & Culture
Department of Communications, Prairie & Northwest Territories Region |
August 1990 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations, Staffing Programs
Public Service Commission, Manitoba/Saskatchewan Region |
June 1988 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Regional Director
Department of Secretary of State, Manitoba Regional Office |
March 1982 to June 1988 | Not a designated office |
Social Development Officer, Multiculturalism Programs
Department of Secretary of State, Manitoba Regional Office |
February 1978 to March 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Minister of Foreign Affairs
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Not Applicable |
January 1996 to October 2000 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification, Not Applicable |
November 1993 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Employment and Immigration
Department of Employment and Immigration, Not Applicable |
November 1993 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Labour
Department of Labour, Not Applicable |
November 1993 to February 1995 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State
Canadian Wheat Board, Not Applicable |
June 1984 to September 1984 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Transport
Transport Canada, Not Applicable |
August 1983 to September 1984 | Not a designated office |
Minister Responsible for the Status of Women
Department of Canadian Heritage, Not Applicable |
March 1980 to September 1981 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Employment and Immigration
Department of Employment and Immigration, Not Applicable |
March 1980 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |