Total Number of Communication Reports: 231
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Mortgage Default Insurance Company
Peter Vukanovich, President & CEO
Address:
2060 Winston Park Dr.
Oakville, ON L6H 5R7
Canada
Telephone number:
905-287-5488
Fax number:
905-287-5472
Genworth Financial Mortgage Insurance Company Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Sagen Mortgage Insurance Company Canada/ | 2021-07-02 | 2021-08-01 |
Genworth Financial Mortgage Insurance Company Canada | 2008-08-07 | 2021-07-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Stuart Levings | 2015-03-17 | 2021-08-01 |
Brian Hurley | 2011-11-01 | 2015-03-17 |
Peter Vukanovich | 2005-12-09 | 2011-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Employer Representative, Employment Insurance Board of Referees
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance Board of Referees |
June 2000 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Industry Canada, Internal Trade Secretariat |
January 1994 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Canadian International Trade Tribunal, Research Branch |
October 1990 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1990 to May 1990 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
December 1989 to December 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Employer Representative, Employment Insurance Board of Referees
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance Board of Referees |
June 2000 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Industry Canada, Internal Trade Secretariat |
January 1994 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Canadian International Trade Tribunal, Research Branch |
October 1990 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1990 to May 1990 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
December 1989 to December 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |