TransCanada operates one of the most sophisticated pipeline systems in the world. Our network of approximately 57,000 km (35,500 mi.) of wholly owned and 11,500 km (7,000 mi.) of partially owned natural gas pipelines connect virtually every major natural gas supply basin and market in North America. TransCanada is one of the continent’s largest providers of natural gas storage and related services with approximately 380 billion cubic feet of regulated storage capacity. TransCanada owns, controls or is developing more than 10,800 megawatts of power generation in Canada and the United States.
Russell Girling, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Department of Revenue (State of Alaska) | $59,600,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
450 - 1st Street, SW
Calgary, AB T2P 5H1
Canada
Telephone number:
403-920-7888
Fax number:
403-920-2412
TransCanada Corporation is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2024-05-09 | current |
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2023-05-03 | 2024-05-09 |
TC Energy Corporation/Corporation TC Énergie | 2019-05-03 | 2023-05-03 |
TransCanada Corporation | 2008-07-02 | 2019-05-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francois Poirier | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Russell Girling | 2010-07-01 | 2021-01-01 |
Harold Kvisle | 2005-10-24 | 2010-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Auditor (Co-operative Summer Student Position)
Consumer & Corporate Affairs, - |
May 1976 to August 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief (Manager)/Acting Director
National Energy Board, Financial Regulation Division |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Economist/Senior Economist
National Energy Board, Economics Division |
1992 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Energy, Mines and Resources, Fiscal Policy Branch |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Student Project Engineer
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal Operations |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contractor
Natural Resources Canada, Natural Resources Canada |
March 2009 to December 2009 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of Finance, Department of Finance |
December 2008 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Canadian Museum of Civilization, Canadian Museum of Civilization |
May 1987 to April 1988 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Senate of Canada, Senate of Canada |
May 1984 to December 1986 | Not a designated office |