Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Agriculture
|
Changes to the Fertilizers Act and regulations regarding the use, registration, or safety of fertilizer products
|
Policies or Program, Regulation
|
Agriculture, Environment
|
Engaging the government on its initiative to reduce fertilizer emissions by 30% from 2020 levels.
|
Regulation, Policies or Program
|
Transportation
|
Explosives Regulations regarding safety and security in handling of explosive precursors to reduce the risk of criminal acts.
|
Regulation
|
Agriculture, Climate, Environment, Mining
|
Input on climate change and greenhouse gas policy, strategies.
|
Policies or Program
|
International Relations, International Trade
|
Input on economic and fiscal policy as it relates to the fertilizer industry in Canada and its global competitiveness.
|
Policies or Program
|
Agriculture, Climate, Environment, Fisheries
|
Input on water policy as it relates to the impact and management of fertilizer products.
|
Policies or Program
|
Agriculture, Transportation
|
Regulations regarding the transportation of dangerous goods and designated fertilizer products.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution, Regulation
|
Fertilizer Canada represents manufacturers, wholesale and retail distributors of nitrogen, phosphate, potash and sulphur fertilizers. The fertilizer industry plays an essential role in Canada's economy, contributing over $12 billion annually and 12,000 jobs. The association is committed to supporting the fertilizer industry with innovative research and programming while advocating sustainability, stewardship, safety and security through standards and Codes of Practice.
Karen Proud, PRESIDENT AND CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2024-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $4,000.00 | No |
Address:
350 Sparks Street
Suite 907
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-723-0777
Ext.
222
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Fertilizer Canada/Fertilisants Canada | 2024-04-18 | current |
Fertilizer Canada/Fertilisants Canada | 2015-08-24 | 2024-04-18 |
Canadian Fertilizer Institute/Institut canadien des engrais | 2008-12-12 | 2015-08-24 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Karen Proud | 2021-04-01 | Current |
Garth Whyte | 2015-06-15 | 2021-04-01 |
CLYDE GRAHAM | 2014-10-01 | 2015-06-15 |
ROGER LARSON | 1996-09-19 | 2014-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Earl Dreeshen Member of Parliament for Red Deer |
September 2014 to December 2015 | Not a designated office |
Members Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Joe Preston Member of Parliament |
November 2012 to May 2014 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Agriculture Canada, Ministers office |
September 2007 to October 2015 | October 19, 2015 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Field Services Training and Response
Public Health Agency of Canada, Office of Public Health Practice |
September 2009 to October 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager
Health Canada, Legislative Renewal Secretariat |
September 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager Departmental Regulatory Affairs
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
May 2004 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
December 2003 to May 2004 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Regulatory Development Unit
Health Canada, Assisted Human Reproduction Implementation Office |
May 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Director
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2002 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Environmental Assessment Initiative
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2001 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Regulatory Affairs Secretariat |
January 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Analyst
Health Canada, Bureau of Tobacco Control |
September 1999 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Product Safety Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Tobacco Enforcement Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1998 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Environmental Health Officer
Health Canada, Medical Services branch |
June 1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Earl Dreeshen Member of Parliament for Red Deer |
September 2014 to December 2015 | Not a designated office |
Members Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Joe Preston Member of Parliament |
November 2012 to May 2014 | Not a designated office |