A global leader in wireless innovation, BlackBerry® revolutionized the mobile industry when it was introduced in 1999. Today, BlackBerry aims to inspire the success of our millions of customers around the world by continuously pushing the boundaries of mobile experiences. Founded in 1984 and based in Waterloo, Ontario, BlackBerry operates offices in North America, Europe, Asia Pacific and Latin America.
John Chen, Executive Chair and CEO
Address:
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7
Canada
Telephone number:
519-888-7465
BlackBerry Limited is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
BlackBerry Limited | 2024-04-30 | current |
BlackBerry Limited | 2013-09-03 | 2024-04-30 |
Research in Motion Limited | 2008-08-14 | 2013-09-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
John Giamatteo | 2023-12-11 | Current |
Richard Lynch | 2023-11-04 | 2023-12-11 |
John Chen | 2013-11-13 | 2023-11-04 |
Thorsten Heins | 2012-03-19 | 2013-11-13 |
Mike Lazaridis | 2005-09-08 | 2012-03-19 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, PCO/PSEPC |
March 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of Public Works, PWGSC |
January 2003 to March 2005 | Not a designated office |
Director of Operations
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister/Minister of Finance, PCO/Department of Finance |
September 1999 to January 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Speaker, House of Commons |
September 1995 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant, Member of Parliament for St. Catharines
House of Commons, House of Commons |
October 1993 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |