CAE is a leading provider of simulation and modelling technologies and integrated training services for civil aviation, and defence customers worldwide.Founded in 1947 and headquartered in Canada, CAE has manufacturing operations and training facilities in 25 countries on five continents. Ninety per cent of CAE's C$1.6 billion annual revenues are derived from worldwide exports. CAE's shares are traded on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges (TSX: CAE; NYSE: CAE) Simulation Products:CAE has simulated almost every modern airliner for both major and regional carriers, as well as many of today's business jets. CAE has long been the world's leading supplier of full-flight simulators, with more than 700 simulators sold to more than 110 airlines, aircraft manufacturers and training centres. CAE also has a wealth of experience in developing prototype simulators for new types of aircraft. Civil Training and Services:CAE is now a world leader in aviation training services, serving all segments of the market including aircraft manufacturers, flight schools, business aircraft and helicopter operators, as well as regional and major airlines. CAE currently has more than 140 full-flight simulators installed in more than 20 training centres worldwide.Military Simulation and Training:CAE is also a global leader in the design of sophisticated military training systems for air, land and sea applications, having supplied the defence forces of more than 30 nations with military training systems and services. In addition to its comprehensive training services, the company offers a range of simulation equipment and modelling and simulation software.
Marc Parent, President and Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2009-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Revenue Canada | 12 958 807,00 $ | Oui |
Technology Partnership Canada | 54 002 488,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
8585 Côte-de-Liesse Rd.
Saint-Laurent, QC H4T 1G6
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
514-734-5730
Numéro de fax :
514-340-5519
cae inc. n'est pas une filiale d'une société mère.
cae inc. ne possède aucune filiale qui pourrait être directement intéressée au résultat de l'engagement
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
cae inc. | 2024-05-31 | actuel |
cae inc. | 2008-08-12 | 2024-05-31 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Marc Parent | 2009-10-01 | Actuel |
ROBERT BROWN | 2005-09-16 | 2009-10-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager of Aircraft Structures
Canadian Forces, Airworthiness Branch |
1989 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Officer - Quality Engineering Test Establishment
Canadian Forces, Hull, Que |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Post-Graduate Training
Canadian Forces, Toronto |
1984 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Aircraft Maintenance Development (Trenton |
1982 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Aerospace Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Air Force |
1980 à 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Maintenance Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Force Base - Greenwood, N.S. |
1980 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Sr. Aerospace Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Bagotville |
1994 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Major
Canadian Forces, Commanding Office |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Lieutenant
Canadian Forces, CF 18 Weapon System Software Unit |
1989 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Master of Engineering Degree
Canadian Forces, RMC and Queens University |
1987 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Lieutenant - Line Service Officer
Canadian Forces, Baden Soellingen, West Germany |
1985 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Canadian Forces Officer Course
Canadian Forces, CFB Chilliwalk |
1982 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Master Caporal
Canadian Forces, Junior Leadership Course |
1980 à 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electrical Engineering Training Program
Canadian Forces, Royal Roads University |
1980 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instructor
Canadian Forces, CFB Borden |
1978 à 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Maintenance Technician
Canadian Forces, Uplands - Ottawa |
1974 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications and Radar Systems Technician
Canadian Forces, Canadian Forces Aerospace & Engineering - Borden |
1974 à 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Recruit Training
Canadian Forces, Canadian Armed Forces |
1973 à 1973 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Detachment Commander
Defence, St. John's NFLD - Cnd Forces Recruiting Center |
juin 1993 à novembre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Captain - Tactics Instructor
Defence, CTC Gagetown NB - Combat Training Centre |
décembre 1991 à juin 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Captain
Defence, CFS St. John's NFLD - Director Reserve/Cadet Support Land |
juin 1989 à août 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
2nd Lieutenant / Lieutenant / Captain
Defence, CFB Valcartier, Que. - 12e Régiment Blindé du Canada |
mai 1987 à juin 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
2nd Lieutenant
Defence, CFB Valcartier, Que. - 12e Régiment Blindé du Canada |
décembre 1986 à mai 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer Cadet
Defence, Combat Training Centre Gagetown, NB - Canadian Armour Corps |
décembre 1985 à décembre 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer Cadet
Defence, CFB Chilliwack, BC - Regular Forces |
septembre 1985 à décembre 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Corporal
Defence, Lanark & Renfrew Scottish Regiment |
juillet 1982 à septembre 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Canadian Forces Reserve
Defence, Infantry Plantoon |
septembre 1981 à juillet 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |