Total Number of Communication Reports: 105
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
1. the national financial intermediary and trade association for credit unions across Canada2. oversees and develops policy for national liquidity pool, and provides non-financial services to support credit union activities and strategies for further development: communications and marketing; electronic network planning; professional development; linkage into national and international ATM networks; development of electronic transfer of funds services3. represents credit unions and maintains close working relationships with other national and international organizations such as: the Canadian Payments Association; Interac Association; the Canadian Co-operative Association; Credit Union Institute of Canada; the Desjardins Group; the Francophone federations outside Quebec; the World Council of Credit Unions which has affiliated members in 80 countries and directs financial and leadership resources to credit unions throughout the world; and the federal government, representing credit unions' interests on issues such as statutes, government regulation of financial services, taxation, liquidity management.
David Phillips, President & Chief Financial Officer
Address:
300 The East Mall
Suite 500
Toronto, ON M9B 6B7
Canada
Telephone number:
416-232-3405
Fax number:
416-232-3470
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Credit Union Central of Canada | 2010-05-31 | 2016-01-11 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
MARTHA DURDIN | 2014-06-09 | 2016-01-11 |
David Phillips | 2006-01-20 | 2014-06-09 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant (Administration)
House of Commons, Office of Michael Ignatieff, MP & Deputy Leader of the Official Opposition |
February 2007 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Isobel Finnerty |
September 1998 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Marian Maloney |
July 1997 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, Offie of the Honourable Jim Peterson, PC., MP |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Political Rsearch Coordinator
Parliament of Canada, Office of The Honourable Jack Layton, P.C., M.P. |
April 2006 to March 2010 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Parliament of Canada, Office of The Honourable Jack Layton, P.C., M.P. |
January 2003 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Parliament of Canada, Office of Alexa McDonough, M.P. |
September 1997 to January 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant (Administration)
House of Commons, Office of Michael Ignatieff, MP & Deputy Leader of the Official Opposition |
February 2007 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Isobel Finnerty |
September 1998 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Marian Maloney |
July 1997 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, Offie of the Honourable Jim Peterson, PC., MP |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |