Nombre total de rapports de communication : 105
Rapports mensuels de communications au cours des 6 derniers mois : 0
1. the national financial intermediary and trade association for credit unions across Canada2. oversees and develops policy for national liquidity pool, and provides non-financial services to support credit union activities and strategies for further development: communications and marketing; electronic network planning; professional development; linkage into national and international ATM networks; development of electronic transfer of funds services3. represents credit unions and maintains close working relationships with other national and international organizations such as: the Canadian Payments Association; Interac Association; the Canadian Co-operative Association; Credit Union Institute of Canada; the Desjardins Group; the Francophone federations outside Quebec; the World Council of Credit Unions which has affiliated members in 80 countries and directs financial and leadership resources to credit unions throughout the world; and the federal government, representing credit unions' interests on issues such as statutes, government regulation of financial services, taxation, liquidity management.
MARTHA DURDIN, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
151 Yonge Street
Suite 1000
Toronto, ON M5C 2W7
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-232-3422
Numéro de fax :
416-232-1720
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Credit Union Central of Canada | 2010-05-31 | 2016-01-11 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
MARTHA DURDIN | 2014-06-09 | 2016-01-11 |
David Phillips | 2006-01-20 | 2014-06-09 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
juin 2013 à avril 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Project Leader
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch, Financial Institutions Division |
2009 à 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
2000 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
juin 2013 à avril 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Project Leader
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch, Financial Institutions Division |
2009 à 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
2000 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Political Rsearch Coordinator
Parliament of Canada, Office of The Honourable Jack Layton, P.C., M.P. |
avril 2006 à mars 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Researcher
Parliament of Canada, Office of The Honourable Jack Layton, P.C., M.P. |
janvier 2003 à mars 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Researcher
Parliament of Canada, Office of Alexa McDonough, M.P. |
septembre 1997 à janvier 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Parliament of Canada, Minister of Revenue |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Media Relations
Parliament of Canada, Office of the Prime Minister |
1980 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant (Administration)
House of Commons, Office of Michael Ignatieff, MP & Deputy Leader of the Official Opposition |
février 2007 à octobre 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Isobel Finnerty |
septembre 1998 à septembre 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
The Senate of Canada, Office of the Honourable Senator Marian Maloney |
juillet 1997 à septembre 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, Offie of the Honourable Jim Peterson, PC., MP |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |