CROPLIFE CANADA (FORMERLY THE CROP PROTECTION INSTITUTE OF CANADA) IS THE TRADE ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING THE DEVELOPERS, MANUFACTURERS AND DISTRIBUTORS OF PLANT SCIENCE INNOVATIONS - PEST CONTROL PRODUCTS AND PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY - FOR USE IN AGRICULTURE, URBAN AND PUBLIC HEALTH SETTINGS. CROPLIFE CANADA STANDS FOR SAFETY AND INNOVATION IN ALL PRODUCTS SUPPORTED BY A FOUNDATION OF CONTINUOUS RESEARCH AND A STRONG COMMITMENT TO STEWARDSHIP.
Ted Menzies, PRESIDENT & CEO
Address:
350 Sparks Street, Suite 202
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-9881
Ext.
3225
Fax number:
613-233-4913
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CROPLIFE CANADA | 2024-05-14 | current |
CROPLIFE CANADA | 2009-12-07 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pierre Petelle | 2016-12-28 | Current |
Ted Menzies | 2014-03-01 | 2016-12-28 |
LORNE HEPWORTH | 1997-12-24 | 2014-03-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, National Manager, Chief & other levels
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Agriculture & AgriFoods Canada, Policy and Programs Branch |
June 1992 to June 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Scientific Evaluator - Biotechnology
Health Canada, Health Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
May 2011 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, National Manager, Chief & other levels
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Agriculture & AgriFoods Canada, Policy and Programs Branch |
June 1992 to June 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Prime Minister, Prime Minister |
April 1990 to July 1993 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Stan Wilbee, Member of Parliament |
January 1989 to January 1990 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Bob Brisco, Member of Parliament |
July 1988 to November 1988 | Not a designated office |