Established by John Kinder Labatt in London, Ontario in 1847, Labatt Breweries is one of Canada's founding businesses and its leading brewer. The company today has more than 3,000 employees, six breweries, and a portfolio of leading brands.
Kyle Norrington, President
Address:
207 Queen Quay West
Suite 299
TORONTO, ON M5J 1A7
Canada
Telephone number:
416-361-5050
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
LABATT BREWERIES OF CANADA | 2024-05-01 | current |
LABATT BREWERIES OF CANADA | 2018-01-09 | 2024-05-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Mika Michaelis | 2021-12-15 | Current |
Jeff Ryan | 2021-11-01 | 2021-12-15 |
Kyle Norrington | 2018-11-01 | 2021-11-01 |
Marcelo Abud | 2018-01-09 | 2018-11-01 |
Miguel Patricio | 2006-03-02 | 2008-05-05 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant to MP George Proud, Special Assistant to Minister of Industry Brian Tobin, Policy Advisor, Minister of Environment David Anderson, Policy Advisor, Minister of Finance John Manley
House of Commons, Minister's office |
October 1998 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant to MP George Proud, Special Assistant to Minister of Industry Brian Tobin, Policy Advisor, Minister of Environment David Anderson, Policy Advisor, Minister of Finance John Manley
House of Commons, Minister's office |
October 1998 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |