Total Number of Communication Reports: 84
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
MTS Allstream Inc. (MTS Allstream) is Canada's third-largest national communications provider, seamlessly blending innovative solutions and world-class technology. In the province of Manitoba, MTS Allstream serves residential and business customers with a full suite of wireline voice, data services, next generation wireless, and MTS TV services. MTS Allstream's Enterprise division services business customer with infrastructure management and information technology services. MTS Allstream has an extensive national broadband fibre optic network and provides international connections through strategic partnerships and interconnection agreements with other international service interconnection agreements with other international service providers.
Pierre Blouin, Chief Executive Officer (CEO)
Address:
333 Main Street
MP19C
Winnipeg, MB R3C 3V6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-688-8774
Fax number:
613-688-8303
MTS Allstream Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
MTS Inc. | 2012-01-01 | 2015-11-09 |
MTS Allstream Inc. | 2008-08-13 | 2012-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kelvin Shepherd | 2012-01-01 | 2015-11-09 |
Pierre Blouin | 2006-04-07 | 2012-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Deparment of Agriculture and Agri-Food, Federal Agriculture Minister |
December 1993 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Legal Policy Analyst
Industry Canada, Telecommunications Policy Branch |
February 1991 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Legal Research Assistant
Industry Canada, Telecommunications Policy Branch |
September 1990 to February 1991 | Not a designated office |
Legal Research Assistant
Industry Canada, Telecommunications Policy Branch |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Researcher
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (formely Canadian Consulate General), Minister of Foreign Affairs |
May 1992 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Support Clerk (summer student)
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (formely Canadian Consulate General), Minister of Foreign Affairs |
May 1991 to August 1991 | Not a designated office |