Manufacture and sale of tobacco products
Mindaugas Trumpaitis, Managing Director
Address:
1500 Don Mills Road
Don Mills, ON M3B 3L1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-449-5525
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. | 2024-09-03 | current |
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. | 2009-01-23 | 2024-09-03 |
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges | 2008-07-04 | 2009-01-23 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Milena Trentadue | 2024-02-01 | Current |
Mindaugas Trumpaitis | 2022-07-18 | 2024-02-01 |
Peter Luongo | 2016-12-01 | 2022-07-18 |
Mindaugas Trumpaitis | 2014-01-20 | 2016-12-01 |
John Barnett | 1999-06-10 | 2014-01-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor (regional advisor)
Office of the Minister of Industry, Ministers' Regional Office |
May 2011 to July 2013 | Not a designated office |
Advance to the Prime Minister
Office of the Prime Minister, Tour Department |
April 2009 to November 2010 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - communication
Office of the Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs, Francophonie and Quebec Region, Quebec Region - Ministers' Regional Office |
March 2009 to November 2009 | Not a designated office |