Engaged in exploration, production and marketing activities for natural gas, natural gas liquids, sulphur and bitumen, and the manufacture, distribution and marketing of refined petroleum products and Oil Sands.
Michael Crothers, President and Canada Country Chair
End date of the last completed financial year: 2014-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of Alberta | $31,800,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
400 4th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 0J4
Canada
Telephone number:
403-384-8741
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Shell Canada Limited | 2024-03-01 | current |
Shell Canada Limited | 2008-09-15 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Susannah pierce | 2021-04-01 | Current |
Michael Crothers | 2016-01-01 | 2021-04-01 |
Lorraine Mitchelmore | 2009-11-01 | 2016-01-01 |
Brian Straub | 2008-09-15 | 2009-11-01 |
David Collyer | 2008-01-30 | 2008-08-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Inventories Engineer
Environment Canada, Science and Technology |
February 2002 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Hon. Lisa Raitt, Minister of Natural Resources |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 26, 2010 |
Chief of Staff
Indian and Northern Affairs, Office of Hon. Chuck Strahl, Minister of Indian and Northern Affairs |
October 2008 to July 2009 | July 31, 2009 |
Director of Strategic Planning and Initiatives
Prime Minister's Office, Planning |
January 2007 to October 2008 | October 31, 2008 |
Director of Communications
Environment Canada, Office of Hon. Rona Ambrose, Minister of Environment |
October 2006 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
International Trade, Office of Hon. David Emerson, Minister of Int'l Trade |
February 2006 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Offices of the Minister, Citizenship and Immigration and Human Resources and Social Development |
August 2006 to February 2008 | Not a designated office |
Issue Management
Prime Minister's Office / Opposition Leader's Office, Issue Management |
May 2005 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Researcher
Opposition Leader's Office, Policy Research |
December 2003 to December 2004 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Diane Ablonczy, MP |
May 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Researcher / Assistant
Senate, Office of Hon. Senator Gerry St. Germain |
March 2003 to April 2003 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, office of Rt. Hon. Joe Clark |
September 2002 to December 2002 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of Chuck Strahl, MP |
April 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of Chuck Strahl, MP |
July 2000 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |