Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 420 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 80 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 192,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2019-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Bank of Canada | $1,375.00 | No |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $74,496.00 | Yes |
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $2,500.00 | No |
Export Development Canada (EDC) | $65,000.00 | Yes |
Global Affairs Canada (GAC) | $2,300.00 | Yes |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $2,300.00 | Yes |
Office of the Privacy Commissioner of Canada (OPC) | $2,000.00 | Yes |
Vancouver Fraser Port Authority (Port Metro Vancouver) | $40,000.00 | Yes |
VIA Rail Canada | $10,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
275 Slater Street
Floor 17
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-4000
Ext.
2245
Fax number:
613-238-7643
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | current |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Current |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Minister’s Office |
July 2013 to August 2015 | August 24, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Minister’s Office |
July 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada / Small Business and Tourism, Minister’s Office |
January 2009 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Minister’s Office |
October 2008 to January 2009 | January 23, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
PMO/PCO, Office of the Prime Minister |
September 2006 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Desk Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, TransAtlantic Defence and Security |
November 2000 to November 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Regional Trade Policy |
May 2010 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Science and Technology, Office of the Minister of State |
May 2009 to September 2009 | September 4, 2009 |
Intern
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister |
May 2008 to September 2008 | September 5, 2008 |
Intern
Office of the Member of Parliament for St Catharines, House of Commons |
September 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Jr. Analyst
Transport Canada, Maritime Policy |
September 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Agriculture and Agrifood Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 2004 to August 2005 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Chief of Staff and Directory of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) (FedNor), Office of the Secretary of State |
July 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
December 1995 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board Secretariat, Office of the President |
December 1993 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
August 1985 to June 1986 | Not a designated office |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
September 1984 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
June 1979 to February 1980 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources, Strategic Policy |
December 2017 to July 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources, Energy Sector |
December 2016 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Minister’s Office |
July 2013 to August 2015 | August 24, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Minister’s Office |
July 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada / Small Business and Tourism, Minister’s Office |
January 2009 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Minister’s Office |
October 2008 to January 2009 | January 23, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
PMO/PCO, Office of the Prime Minister |
September 2006 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, House of Commons |
April 2004 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |