Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 420 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 80 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 192,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2019-12-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Administration portuaire Vancouver Fraser (Port Metro Vancouver) | 40 000,00 $ | Oui |
Affaires mondiales Canada (AMC) | 2 300,00 $ | Oui |
Banque du Canada | 1 375,00 $ | Non |
Commissariat à la protection de la vie privée du Canada (CPVP) | 2 000,00 $ | Oui |
Emploi et Développement social Canada (EDSC) | 74 496,00 $ | Oui |
Environnement et Changement climatique Canada (ECCC) | 2 500,00 $ | Non |
Exportation et développement Canada (EDC) | 65 000,00 $ | Oui |
Innovation, Sciences et Développement économique Canada (ISDE) | 2 300,00 $ | Oui |
VIA Rail Canada | 10 000,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
275 Slater Street
Floor 17
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-238-4000
Poste
2245
Numéro de fax :
613-238-7643
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | actuel |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Actuel |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Minister’s Office |
juillet 2013 à août 2015 | août 24, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Minister’s Office |
juillet 2011 à juillet 2013 | juillet 15, 2013 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada / Small Business and Tourism, Minister’s Office |
janvier 2009 à mai 2011 | mai 18, 2011 |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Minister’s Office |
octobre 2008 à janvier 2009 | janvier 23, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
PMO/PCO, Office of the Prime Minister |
septembre 2006 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Desk Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, TransAtlantic Defence and Security |
novembre 2000 à novembre 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Regional Trade Policy |
mai 2010 à décembre 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Intern
Science and Technology, Office of the Minister of State |
mai 2009 à septembre 2009 | septembre 4, 2009 |
Intern
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister |
mai 2008 à septembre 2008 | septembre 5, 2008 |
Intern
Office of the Member of Parliament for St Catharines, House of Commons |
septembre 2007 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Jr. Analyst
Transport Canada, Maritime Policy |
septembre 2017 à décembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Agriculture and Agrifood Canada, Office of the Minister |
juin 2004 à août 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Chief of Staff and Directory of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
décembre 2003 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) (FedNor), Office of the Secretary of State |
juillet 2001 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
décembre 1995 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board Secretariat, Office of the President |
décembre 1993 à décembre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
août 1985 à juin 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
septembre 1984 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
juin 1979 à février 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources, Strategic Policy |
décembre 2017 à juillet 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources, Energy Sector |
décembre 2016 à décembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Minister’s Office |
juillet 2013 à août 2015 | août 24, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Minister’s Office |
juillet 2011 à juillet 2013 | juillet 15, 2013 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada / Small Business and Tourism, Minister’s Office |
janvier 2009 à mai 2011 | mai 18, 2011 |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Minister’s Office |
octobre 2008 à janvier 2009 | janvier 23, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
PMO/PCO, Office of the Prime Minister |
septembre 2006 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, House of Commons |
avril 2004 à septembre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |