Further the interests of Canadian grain, oilseed, and pulse producers
Richard Phillips, Executive Director, Grain Growers of Canada
Address:
Suite 912 - 350 Sparks Street
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-875-1795
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Grain Growers of Canada/Les producteurs de grains du Canada | 2024-03-25 | current |
Grain Growers of Canada/Les producteurs de grains du Canada | 2008-07-29 | 2024-03-25 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kyle Larkin | 2023-07-17 | Current |
Erin Gowriluk | 2019-01-07 | 2023-07-17 |
Lindsey Ehman | 2017-11-20 | 2019-01-07 |
Fiona Cook | 2016-05-09 | 2017-11-20 |
Geneviève Riberdy | 2016-02-12 | 2016-05-09 |
Bryan Rogers | 2014-03-03 | 2016-02-12 |
Janet Krayden | 2013-10-01 | 2014-03-03 |
Richard Phillips | 2006-11-17 | 2013-07-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Ministerial Assistant
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Minister's Office |
February 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Ministerial Assistant
Treasury Board, Minister's Office |
February 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Ministerial Assistant
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Minister's Office |
February 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Ministerial Assistant
Treasury Board, Minister's Office |
February 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |