Nombre total de rapports de communication : 45
Rapports mensuels de communications au cours des 6 derniers mois : 0
A national professional body working in the public interest, FP Canada™ is dedicated to championing better financial wellness for all Canadians by certifying professional financial planners and leading the advancement of professional financial planning in Canada. At a high level, FP Canada sets the strategic direction for professional financial planning in Canada. FP Canada also achieves its mandate through two distinct divisions. Through the FP Canada Standards Council™ division, FP Canada establishes financial planning standards and enforces those standards among FP Canada certificants—Qualified Associate Financial Planner™ professionals and Certified Financial Planner® professionals. Through the FP Canada Institute™ division, which is dedicated to elevating the practice of financial planning, FP Canada provides professional education, tools, and resources to help financial planners meet the needs of all Canadians. FP Canada operates in all provinces except Québec. There are approximately 19,000 professional financial planners in Canada who, through QAFP certification and CFP certification, meet FP Canada’s standards.
Tashia Batstone, President & CEO
Adresse :
902-375 University Avenue
Toronto, ON M5G 2J5
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-593-8587
Poste
284
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
FP Canada/ | 2024-04-04 | actuel |
FP Canada/ | 2020-11-23 | 2024-04-04 |
Financial Planning Standards Council | 2011-11-22 | 2014-12-02 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Tashia Batstone | 2021-05-03 | Actuel |
Cary List | 2011-11-22 | 2021-05-03 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
MP Liaison, Ontario Desk
Ministry of National Revenue, Minister's Office |
août 2003 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament for Thornhill |
août 2001 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament for Thornhill |
décembre 2000 à août 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |