The Heart and Stroke Foundation, a volunteer-based health charity and federation of 10 provincial foundations, leads in eliminating heart disease and stroke and reducing their impact through the advancement of research and its application, the promotion of healthy living, and advocacy.
SALLY BROWN, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
1402-222 Queen Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5V9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-569-4361
Ext.
328
Fax number:
613-569-3278
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2024-04-01 | current |
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2009-02-10 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Doug Roth | 2020-03-23 | Current |
Diego Marchese | 2020-02-29 | 2020-03-23 |
Yves Savoie | 2017-04-26 | 2020-02-29 |
Diego Marchese | 2016-08-01 | 2017-04-26 |
David Sculthorpe | 2011-10-03 | 2016-08-01 |
Bobbe Wood | 2010-10-20 | 2011-10-02 |
SALLY BROWN | 2002-01-24 | 2010-10-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economic Policy Advisor
Prime Minister's Office, Reporting to Tom Trbovich |
April 1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economic Policy Advisor
Prime Minister's Office, Reporting to Tom Trbovich |
April 1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Stan Dromisky, MP |
February 1994 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |