The Heart and Stroke Foundation, a volunteer-based health charity across Canada, leads in eliminating heart disease and stroke and reducing their impact through the advancement of research and its application, the promotion of healthy living, and advocacy.
David Sculthorpe, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2015-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
BC Provincial Govenment | $1,287,027.00 | Yes |
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $5,000.00 | No |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $98,794.00 | Yes |
MB Provincial Government | $56,000.00 | Yes |
NL Provincial Government | $130,000.00 | Yes |
NS Provincial Government | $180,000.00 | Yes |
PEI Provincial Government | $82,883.59 | Yes |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $3,769,197.34 | Yes |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $12,475.43 | No |
Address:
1402-222 Queen Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5V9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-569-4361
Fax number:
613-569-3278
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2024-04-01 | current |
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2009-02-10 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Doug Roth | 2020-03-23 | Current |
Diego Marchese | 2020-02-29 | 2020-03-23 |
Yves Savoie | 2017-04-26 | 2020-02-29 |
Diego Marchese | 2016-08-01 | 2017-04-26 |
David Sculthorpe | 2011-10-03 | 2016-08-01 |
Bobbe Wood | 2010-10-20 | 2011-10-02 |
SALLY BROWN | 2002-01-24 | 2010-10-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor
Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Stan Dromisky, MP |
February 1994 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor
Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
House of Commons, Office of Roy Cullen, M.P. |
March 2000 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of David Iftody, M.P. |
February 1999 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
House of Commons, Secretary of State, Science, Research and Development (Industry Canada) |
February 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Outreach and Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jack Layton, MP |
October 2010 to February 2011 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Charlie Angus, MP |
September 2004 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |