Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Aboriginal Affairs, Budget, Health
|
ADVOCATE FOR IMPROVEMENTS TO THE NON-INSURED HEALTH BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR FIRST NATIONS AND INUIT.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Health
|
ENSURE IMPLEMENTATION OF FRONT OF PACKAGE NUTRITION LABELLING ON FOOD AND BEVERAGE PRODUCTS
|
Regulation
|
Budget, Health, Transportation
|
ENSURE THAT THE DEDICATED FEDERAL ACTIVE TRANSPORTATION INFRASTRUCTURE FUND BECOMES A PERMANENT ENVELOPE IN CANADA'S INFRASTRUCTURE FUNDING.
|
Policies or Program
|
Federal-Provincial Relations, Health, Taxation and Finance
|
FINALIZE REGULATIONS TO RESTRICT VAPE FLAVOURS (INCLUDING MINT/MENTHOL); INTRODUCE PLAIN AND STANDARDIZED VAPING PACKAGING; INCREASE TOBACCO AND VAPE TAXES; IMPLEMENT A TOBACCO COST RECOVERY FEE; PROHIBIT THE SALE OF TOBACCO PRODUCTS AMONGST INDIVIDUALS BORN BEFORE A DETERMINED YEAR; INCREASE THE MINIMUM LEGAL AGE OF SMOKING AND VAPING TO 21 YEARS OF AGE.
|
Regulation
|
Budget, Federal-Provincial Relations, Health
|
FUND PUBLIC AWARENESS FOR IMPROVED USE OF DEFIBRILLATORS AND CPR. ADVOCATE FOR A TAX-EXEMPTION ON THE SALE OF DEFIBRILLATORS.
|
Grant, Contribution or Other Financial Benefit
|
Budget, Health
|
IMPLEMENT A NATIONAL SCHOOL NUTRITION PROGRAM
|
Policies or Program
|
Health, Taxation and Finance
|
IMPLEMENT A TAX ON SUGARY DRINKS. REVENUES FROM SUCH A TAXATION STREAM SHOULD BE USED TO SUBSIDIZE HEALTHY EATING INITIATIVES
|
Regulation
|
Broadcasting, Education, Health, Industry, Media
|
IMPLEMENT REGULATIONS TO RESTRICT COMMERCIAL MARKETING OF UNHEALTHY FOODS AND BEVERAGES TO CHILDREN
|
Regulation
|
Aboriginal Affairs, Budget, Federal-Provincial Relations, Health
|
INTRODUCTION OF A NATIONAL PHARMACARE PROGRAM
|
Policies or Program
|
Budget, Health, Research and Development, Science and Technology
|
SECURE FUNDING TO SUPPORT HEART & STROKE'S WOMEN'S HEART AND BRAIN INITIATIVE
|
Grant, Contribution or Other Financial Benefit
|
The Heart and Stroke Foundation, a volunteer-based health charity across Canada, leads in eliminating heart disease and stroke and reducing their impact through the advancement of research and its application, the promotion of healthy living, and advocacy.
Doug Roth, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of British Columbia | $750,000.00 | Yes |
Government of Newfoundland and Labrador | $99,365.61 | Yes |
Government of Saskatchewan | $62,500.00 | Yes |
Address:
1200-2300 Yonge St
P.O. Box 2414
Toronto, ON M4P 1E4
Canada
Telephone number:
888-473-4636
Fax number:
866-650-6167
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2024-04-01 | current |
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada/Fondation des maladies du coeur et de l’AVC | 2009-02-10 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Doug Roth | 2020-03-23 | Current |
Diego Marchese | 2020-02-29 | 2020-03-23 |
Yves Savoie | 2017-04-26 | 2020-02-29 |
Diego Marchese | 2016-08-01 | 2017-04-26 |
David Sculthorpe | 2011-10-03 | 2016-08-01 |
Bobbe Wood | 2010-10-20 | 2011-10-02 |
SALLY BROWN | 2002-01-24 | 2010-10-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications & Policy Advisor to the Parliamentary Secretary
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, House of Commons |
February 2014 to November 2015 | November 13, 2015 |
Executive Assistant
Minister of State (Sport), House of Commons |
June 2011 to February 2014 | February 10, 2014 |
Special Assistant
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Citizenship and Immigration, House of Commons |
February 2011 to June 2011 | June 17, 2011 |
Special Assistant
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Nation Defense, House of Commons |
May 2010 to February 2011 | February 11, 2011 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications & Policy Advisor to the Parliamentary Secretary
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, House of Commons |
February 2014 to November 2015 | November 13, 2015 |
Executive Assistant
Minister of State (Sport), House of Commons |
June 2011 to February 2014 | February 10, 2014 |
Special Assistant
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Citizenship and Immigration, House of Commons |
February 2011 to June 2011 | June 17, 2011 |
Special Assistant
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Nation Defense, House of Commons |
May 2010 to February 2011 | February 11, 2011 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Omar Alghabra, MP |
July 2020 to October 2021 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Lloyd St. Amand, MP |
April 2008 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Stan Dromisky, MP |
February 1994 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |