Total Number of Communication Reports: 227
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Basé au Canada, Enerkem est un chef de file mondial dans le développement et la production de carburants liquides avancés et de produits chimiques verts. Enerkem est une compagnie privée qui a l’appui financier majoritaire d’investisseurs institutionnels et spécialisés dans les technologies propres, incluant Rho Ventures, Braemar Energy Venture et BDR Capital.
Vincent Chornet, Président et chef de la direction
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Alberta Energy Research Institute | $2,000,000.00 | Yes |
Sustainable Development Technology Canada | $1,000,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
615 Bl. Rene-Levesque Ouest #820
Montreal, QC H3B 1P5
Canada
Telephone number:
514-875-0284
Ext.
222
Enerkem Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Enerkem Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Enerkem Inc. | 2024-03-20 | current |
Enerkem Inc. | 2009-05-22 | 2024-03-20 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michel Chornet | 2024-06-27 | Current |
Dominique Boies | 2019-07-12 | 2024-06-27 |
Vincent Chornet | 2009-05-22 | 2019-07-12 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Officer
Privy Council Office, Senior Personnel Division |
August 1995 to September 1996 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer
Industry Canada, Aerospace, Marine and Defence Branch |
July 1994 to August 1995 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer
Departement of National Defense, Directorate General, International & Industry Program |
July 1993 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Officer
Privy Council Office, Senior Personnel Division |
August 1995 to September 1996 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer
Industry Canada, Aerospace, Marine and Defence Branch |
July 1994 to August 1995 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer
Departement of National Defense, Directorate General, International & Industry Program |
July 1993 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |