Bruce Power is a private sector generator of electricity focussing on the operation of nuclear power plants.
Michael Rencheck, President and Chief Financial Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of Ontario | $260,815.00 | Yes |
Address:
PO Box 3000
177 Tie Road
Tiverton, ON N0G 2T0
Canada
Telephone number:
519-361-2673
Bruce Power is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Bruce Power does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bruce Power | 2024-04-12 | current |
Bruce Power | 2008-09-02 | 2024-04-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Eric Chassard | 2024-07-01 | Current |
Michael Rencheck | 2016-08-15 | 2024-07-01 |
Kevin Kelly | 2016-04-30 | 2016-08-15 |
Duncan Hawthorne | 2005-11-01 | 2016-04-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Government Services, Minister's Office |
June 1993 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Department of Industry Science and Technology and International Trade, Minister's Office |
April 1991 to June 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Department of Finance, Ministers Office |
November 1990 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director
Office of the Prime Minister, Appointments Secretariat |
March 1988 to November 1990 | Not a designated office |
Reply Writer
Office of the Prime Minister, Correspondence Unit |
May 1987 to March 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Program Officier
Environment Canada, Mining Standards, Minerals and Metals Division |
May 2000 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |