Bruce Power is a private sector generator of electricity focussing on the operation of nuclear power plants.
Michael Rencheck, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2022-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of Ontario (Ministry of Labour, Immigration, Training and Skills Development) | $240,733.00 | Yes |
Address:
PO Box 3000
177 Tie Road
Tiverton, ON N0G 2T0
Canada
Telephone number:
519-361-2673
Bruce Power is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Bruce Power does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bruce Power | 2024-04-12 | current |
Bruce Power | 2008-09-02 | 2024-04-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Eric Chassard | 2024-07-01 | Current |
Michael Rencheck | 2016-08-15 | 2024-07-01 |
Kevin Kelly | 2016-04-30 | 2016-08-15 |
Duncan Hawthorne | 2005-11-01 | 2016-04-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Directorate of Assessment and Analysis
Canadian Nuclear Safety Commission, Technical Support Branch |
July 2020 to June 2022 | Not a designated office |
Director General, Directorate of Environmental and Radiation Protection and Assessment
Canadian Nuclear Safety Commission, Technical Support Branch |
February 2016 to July 2020 | Not a designated office |
Director, Nuclear Processing Facilities Division
Canadian Nuclear Safety Commission, Regulatory Operations Branch |
September 2013 to February 2016 | Not a designated office |
Director, Environmental Risk Assessment Division
Canadian Nuclear Safety Commission, Technical Support Branch |
2009 to 2013 | Not a designated office |
Environmental Assessment Specialist
Canadian Nuclear Safety Commission, Regulatory Operations Branch |
September 2003 to 2009 | Not a designated office |