THE PEMBINA INSTITUTE IS A NON PROFIT ENVIRONMENTAL ORGANIZATION FOCUSED ON SUSTAINABLE ENERGY. THE INSTITUTE UNDERTAKES POLICY RESEARCH, ANALYSIS AND ADVOCACY, PUBLIC OUTREACH, FORMAL EDUCATION PROGRAMS, AND PROVIDES STRATEGIC AND TECHNICAL ADVISORY SERVICES.
MARLO RAYNOLDS, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Address:
SUITE 200, 608 7 Street S.W.
CALGARY, AB T2P 1Z2
Canada
Telephone number:
403-269-3344
Fax number:
403-269-3377
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
PEMBINA INSTITUTE | 2024-05-15 | current |
PEMBINA INSTITUTE | 2008-09-05 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chris Severson-Baker | 2022-08-09 | Current |
Simon Dyer | 2022-07-26 | 2022-08-09 |
LINDA COADY | 2020-04-01 | 2022-07-26 |
Simon Dyer | 2018-09-10 | 2020-04-01 |
Glen Murray | 2017-09-05 | 2018-09-10 |
Simon Dyer | 2017-08-01 | 2017-09-05 |
Ed Whittingham | 2012-07-14 | 2017-08-01 |
MARLO RAYNOLDS | 2005-02-06 | 2012-07-14 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Infrastructure Canada, Office of John Godfrey, Minister of State (Infrastructure and Com |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Parliamentary Internship Programme (Canadian Political Science Association), Office of John Godfrey, MP |
January 2004 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Parliamentary Internship Programme (Canadian Political Science Association), Office of Bob Mills, MP |
September 2003 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Industry Canada, Strategis Marketing Division |
May 2000 to May 2001 | Not a designated office |